U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00486-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tierno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [RISE or HOPE Program Referral Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.