U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00485-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Early Termination of Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Review of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.