U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00491-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiago-Ontivreos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Re-Appoint Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.