U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yamamoto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Release Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Petition and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Review of Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 19, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.