U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.