U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthew Jacob Morrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.