U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00483-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benally
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.