U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 10, 2022: [Fast Track Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.