U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00451-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Granado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 29, 2022: [Furlough]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 11, 2022: [Furlough]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 19, 2022: [Furlough]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.