U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00434-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kaze
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.