U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00467-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortes-Villalon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.