U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00456-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bridgewater
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Review of Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 26, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.