U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00493-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Suppress]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 26, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.