U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00494-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taufa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.