U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00448-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tinnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.