U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00472-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • August 25, 2022: [Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.