U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00469-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [RISE Program Referral Order]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.