U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor Doc Pearson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.