U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00481-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Petition and Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.