U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00496-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Webber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.