U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • March 30, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 08, 2021: [Reassign Case]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.