U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00490-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.