U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00321-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Review of Detention]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.