U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00500-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Atkin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 17, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.