U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00473-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Malozi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.