U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McTee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Consent Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition and Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Review of Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 07, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.