U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00488-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dean, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.