U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00499-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arreola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.