U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00478-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.