U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00497-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Darragh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2022: [Produce]
  • September 07, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.