U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00513-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2023: [Trial Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.