U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00506-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bench
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.