U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00507-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benitez-Zaragoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.