U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00484-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Idress
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.