U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00453-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lint
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 10, 2022: [Trial Order]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.