U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00515-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto Bojorquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.