U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 14, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.