U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seaman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Writ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.