U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00517-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.