U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sarah Jane Goins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.