U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00511-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Petition and Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Associate Case]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.