U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patane et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Travel]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Joinder]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2021: [Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.