U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Petition and Order]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.