U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00489-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.