U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00521-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.