U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00526-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zamora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.