U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00525-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bloomfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Review of Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.