U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00364-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.