U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baghoomian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.