U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Palmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.